Texas 2023 - 88th 1st C.S.

Texas House Bill HB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 30, 2023
Bill May 30, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 30, 2023
Analysis May 30, 2023

Engrossed

Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill May 31, 2023
Bill May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill June 6, 2023
Analysis June 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note June 8, 2023
Fiscal Note June 6, 2023
Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note May 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill June 6, 2023
Bill May 30, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis June 2, 2023
Analysis May 30, 2023