Texas 2023 - 88th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR16 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/13/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 16


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A full and generous life drew to a close with the
 passing of Mary Ann Dodds on May 24, 2022, at the age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, The only child of Russell and Erma Chamberlain, the
 former Mary Ann Chamberlain was born on July 13, 1938, in Clay
 Center, Kansas, and she grew up in nearby Riley; she attended Riley
 High School, where she was an exceptional student and a
 cheerleader, and she also had a job at the local drug store; she
 continued her education at Kansas State University, and during her
 college years, she worked for the president of the university and
 participated in Pi Beta Phi; and
 WHEREAS, On August 18, 1957, she wed her childhood
 sweetheart, DeLoss Dodds; in the course of their 64 years of
 marriage, Mrs. Dodds supported her husband in his career as a
 university track coach and athletics director, serving as the team
 "mom" and traveling to sporting events around the country; and
 WHEREAS, Above all else, Mrs. Dodds was a devoted mother to
 her three children, Doug, Deidre, and Debra, and she delighted in
 becoming "Nana" to her seven grandchildren, Steffan, Hailey, Will,
 Sommer, Emily, Alexis, and Allison, and two great-grandchildren,
 Bennett and Kathleen; she enjoyed cooking and baking for her loved
 ones, who cherished her Sunday night dinners, and she was renowned
 for her chocolate "track cake"; and
 WHEREAS, Admired for her warmth, wit, and elegance, Mary Ann
 Dodds brightened the world for all who knew her, and they will
 forever hold her close in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Mary Ann Dodds and extend sincere condolences to her loved ones;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Mary Ann
 Dodds.
 Howard
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 16 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on July 13, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House