Texas 2023 - 88th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR12 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 07/05/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 12
 In Memory
 of
 Homer Hogues
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Homer Hogues, who died June 27, 2023, at
 the age of 96; and
 WHEREAS, Homer Hogues was born on April 19, 1927, in
 Navasota to Leroy and Lucinda Hogues; an exemplary serviceman
 with the Tuskegee Airmen, he devoted his life to honoring his
 country and his family and serving his fellow Americans; and
 WHEREAS, After brief stints at Fort Sam Houston and
 Shepherd Air Force Base, Homer arranged to be transferred to the
 Tuskegee Airmen as part of the 99th Fighter Squadron in the 332nd
 Fighter Group of the United States Army Air Forces; with his
 fellow Airmen, Staff Sergeant Hogues broke through racial
 barriers in the United States Army Air Forces through his
 distinguished service and support of the first African American
 military pilots; and
 WHEREAS, During his years of active service, Staff
 Sergeant Hogues received specialized training on the P-47
 Thunderbolt aircraft and helped prepare airplanes for the first
 Air Force gunnery competition in 1949, which resulted in a
 victory for the Tuskegee Airmen; he was noted for his exceptional
 skill as mechanic and for his steadfast commitment to his fellow
 servicemen; he was selected to participate in the second term
 inaugural parade of President Harry S. Truman, and he attended
 the 2012 inaugural parade of President Barack Obama; and
 WHEREAS, Homer returned to Texas after his military
 service and worked as a hard-chrome plater at Lane Plating Works
 for almost four decades; he remained an active member of his
 community and a proud representative of the Tuskegee Airmen, and
 he often spoke at schools, churches, and businesses about the
 Airmen and his trailblazing military career; and
 WHEREAS, Homer was married to the love of his life, Mattie
 Hogues, for 76 years; through all his endeavors, Homer enjoyed
 the love and care of his beloved Mattie until her passing on
 June 25, 2023, two days before Homer's death; and
 WHEREAS, Homer Hogues inspired all who knew him through his
 bravery, his love of family, and his lifelong patriotism; he
 leaves behind a legacy of service and memories that will long be
 cherished by all who were privileged to share in his life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby extend sincere condolences
 to the bereaved family of Homer Hogues; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Homer Hogues.
 West
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on July 5, 2023, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate