Senate | 10/26/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 108 | |
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 108 | |
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 107 | |
House | 10/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 115 | |
House | 10/26/2023 | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution | Journal Page: 102 | |
House | 10/26/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 102 | |
House | 10/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#59 | Journal Page: 102 |
House | 10/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 102 | |
House | 10/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 102 | |
House | 10/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 102 | |
House | 10/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#24 | Journal Page: 60 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 60 | |
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment withdrawn | 6-Thierry | Journal Page: 60 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment withdrawn 6-Thierry | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | 5-J. Gonzlez | Journal Page: 59 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption 5-J. González | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Amended | 4-Martinez Fischer | Journal Page: 57 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Record vote RV#22 | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Amended 4-Martinez Fischer | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment withdrawn 3-Hinojosa | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 3-Hinojosa | Journal Page: 57 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Article III, Section 40 | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Article III, Section 40 | Journal Page: 57 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered 2-Martinez Fischer | ||
House | 10/25/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1) | Journal Page: 55 |
House | 10/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 54 | |
House | 10/25/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 98 | |
House | 10/23/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 10/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 10/13/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 108 | |
House | 10/13/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 17 | |
House | 10/13/2023 | Filed |