E | 11/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 11/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | ||
Senate | 11/07/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 137 | |
House | 11/07/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 136 | |
House | 11/07/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 139 | |
House | 11/07/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 11/05/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 134 | |
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 130 | |
House | 11/01/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 125 | |
House | 11/01/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 125 | |
House | 10/11/2023 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | Journal Page: 8 | |
House | 10/06/2023 | Filed |