Texas 2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HCR27 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.C.R. No. 27
1+88S31135 BPG-D
2+ By: Craddick H.C.R. No. 27
23
34
4- HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
5+ CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
56 WHEREAS, Pioneering Texas vintner Hugo Edwin Auler passed
67 away on October 14, 2023, at the age of 78, bringing a great loss to
78 his family and many friends; and
89 WHEREAS, The son of Mary and Hugo Auler, Ed Auler was born in
910 Austin on July 28, 1945; while a student at The University of Texas
1011 at Austin, he met the love of his life, the former Susan Teeple, and
1112 they were married on June 17, 1967; he enlisted in the U.S. Army
1213 Reserve, and after completing his law degree, he joined the firm of
1314 Kendall, Randall, Finch, and Osborne; he also began running his
1415 family's Fall Creek Ranch in the Hill Country; in 1973, he and his
1516 wife traveled to France to observe a cattle operation, and at her
1617 suggestion, they explored the wine country, too; they ultimately
1718 spent just three days looking at cattle and over two weeks learning
1819 about wine in various regions; and
1920 WHEREAS, Mr. Auler planted his own small vineyard at home
2021 within two years and quickly expanded a quarter-acre plot to seven
2122 and a half acres; in the 1980s, he gave up his law practice and
2223 purchased 400 acres along the west side of Lake Buchanan to
2324 establish Fall Creek Vineyards, blazing a trail for the development
2425 of the Hill Country as a vibrant wine region; over the years, his
2526 wines garnered hundreds of awards; he was a great champion of the
2627 state's industry and advocated for legislation that has helped it
2728 flourish; moreover, he was a mentor to many, and he and his wife
2829 founded the Austin Food and Wine Festival; and
2930 WHEREAS, Although wine was his passion, Mr. Auler was
3031 involved in the energy, real estate, and banking industries as
3132 well; he was a member of the advisory board of Frost Bank; dedicated
3233 to his community, he served on the boards of numerous
3334 organizations, among them St. David's Hospital Foundation and
3435 St. Andrew's Episcopal School; he was president of the Admirals
3536 Club of Austin and Tarry House; he received myriad accolades,
3637 including the People of Vision Award from the Texas Society to
3738 Prevent Blindness and the Service Award from the Colorado River
3839 Foundation; and
3940 WHEREAS, Mr. Auler loved the outdoors and traveling the world
4041 with his wife; a pilot for 39 years, he introduced a future
4142 commander of the Air Force One program to flying; he enjoyed playing
4243 guitar and learning about history, geography, and archeology; above
4344 all, he was devoted to his family; he took his sons, Chad and Mark,
4445 on hunting and fishing trips and coached basketball when they were
4546 young; in later years, he delighted in spending time with his
4647 grandchildren and cheering them on at their athletic events and
4748 dance recitals; and
4849 WHEREAS, Admired for his kindness, patience, and dedication,
4950 Ed Auler lived a caring and purposeful life, and he will be
5051 remembered with admiration and affection by all who were privileged
5152 to know him; now, therefore, be it
5253 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas,
5354 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of Hugo Edwin
5455 Auler and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family:
5556 to his wife, Susan Auler; to his children, Chad Auler and his wife,
5657 Stacy, and Mark Auler and his wife, Clary; to his grandchildren,
5758 Yates, Charles, Ash, Daisy, and Shelby Auler; to his sister, Mary
5859 Ann Meyers; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it
5960 further
6061 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
6162 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
6263 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
6364 Ed Auler.
64- Craddick
65- ______________________________ ______________________________
66- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
67- I certify that H.C.R. No. 27 was unanimously adopted by a
68- rising vote of the House on November 1, 2023.
69- ______________________________
70- Chief Clerk of the House
71- I certify that H.C.R. No. 27 was unanimously adopted by a
72- rising vote of the Senate on November 5, 2023.
73- ______________________________
74- Secretary of the Senate
75- APPROVED: __________________
76- Date
77- __________________
78- Governor