H.C.R. No. 27 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION WHEREAS, Pioneering Texas vintner Hugo Edwin Auler passed away on October 14, 2023, at the age of 78, bringing a great loss to his family and many friends; and WHEREAS, The son of Mary and Hugo Auler, Ed Auler was born in Austin on July 28, 1945; while a student at The University of Texas at Austin, he met the love of his life, the former Susan Teeple, and they were married on June 17, 1967; he enlisted in the U.S. Army Reserve, and after completing his law degree, he joined the firm of Kendall, Randall, Finch, and Osborne; he also began running his family's Fall Creek Ranch in the Hill Country; in 1973, he and his wife traveled to France to observe a cattle operation, and at her suggestion, they explored the wine country, too; they ultimately spent just three days looking at cattle and over two weeks learning about wine in various regions; and WHEREAS, Mr. Auler planted his own small vineyard at home within two years and quickly expanded a quarter-acre plot to seven and a half acres; in the 1980s, he gave up his law practice and purchased 400 acres along the west side of Lake Buchanan to establish Fall Creek Vineyards, blazing a trail for the development of the Hill Country as a vibrant wine region; over the years, his wines garnered hundreds of awards; he was a great champion of the state's industry and advocated for legislation that has helped it flourish; moreover, he was a mentor to many, and he and his wife founded the Austin Food and Wine Festival; and WHEREAS, Although wine was his passion, Mr. Auler was involved in the energy, real estate, and banking industries as well; he was a member of the advisory board of Frost Bank; dedicated to his community, he served on the boards of numerous organizations, among them St. David's Hospital Foundation and St. Andrew's Episcopal School; he was president of the Admirals Club of Austin and Tarry House; he received myriad accolades, including the People of Vision Award from the Texas Society to Prevent Blindness and the Service Award from the Colorado River Foundation; and WHEREAS, Mr. Auler loved the outdoors and traveling the world with his wife; a pilot for 39 years, he introduced a future commander of the Air Force One program to flying; he enjoyed playing guitar and learning about history, geography, and archeology; above all, he was devoted to his family; he took his sons, Chad and Mark, on hunting and fishing trips and coached basketball when they were young; in later years, he delighted in spending time with his grandchildren and cheering them on at their athletic events and dance recitals; and WHEREAS, Admired for his kindness, patience, and dedication, Ed Auler lived a caring and purposeful life, and he will be remembered with admiration and affection by all who were privileged to know him; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of Hugo Edwin Auler and extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife, Susan Auler; to his children, Chad Auler and his wife, Stacy, and Mark Auler and his wife, Clary; to his grandchildren, Yates, Charles, Ash, Daisy, and Shelby Auler; to his sister, Mary Ann Meyers; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of Ed Auler. Craddick ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 27 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the House on November 1, 2023. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.C.R. No. 27 was unanimously adopted by a rising vote of the Senate on November 5, 2023. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor