E
|
11/21/2023
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
February 6, 2024
|
|
E
|
11/21/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
E
|
11/02/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 127
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 136
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 126
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 109
|
Senate
|
10/26/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 107
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 101
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#58
|
Journal Page: 101
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 101
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 101
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 101
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#20
|
Journal Page: 53
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 53
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote RV#19
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
7-Ramos
|
Journal Page: 52
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote RV#18
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote RV#17
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Garcia
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote RV#16
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote RV#15
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Perez
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Record vote RV#14
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Flores
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 44
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 98
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
House
|
10/13/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 17
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#58
|
Journal Page: 101
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 101
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Moody
|
Journal Page: 44
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 44
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 89
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 36
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 35
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 35
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Menndez
|
Journal Page: 34
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 32
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 32
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Flores
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 32
|
Senate
|
10/12/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 85
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 10
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 16
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 85
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 5
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Referred to Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 4
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|