Texas 2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis October 9, 2023
Bill October 9, 2023
Bill October 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill October 23, 2023
Analysis October 23, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill October 13, 2023
Bill October 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill October 11, 2023
Analysis October 10, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill October 26, 2023
Bill October 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis October 23, 2023
Analysis October 10, 2023
Analysis October 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill October 23, 2023
Bill October 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note October 13, 2023
Fiscal Note October 10, 2023
Fiscal Note October 9, 2023