Texas 2023 - 88th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR71 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 11/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 71
 In Memory
 of
 Corbet Jones
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Corbet
 Nicholos Jones of Broaddus, who passed away on October 23, 2023,
 at the age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Charlie and Reba Jones, Corbet Jones
 was born on July 22, 1950, in Center and grew up in Broaddus
 with five siblings, Charlene, Kenneth, Nelda, Robert, and
 Isaac; he graduated from high school in 1968 and enlisted in
 the U.S. Army; following his training at Fort Polk in
 Louisiana, he received orders to ship to Vietnam, but because
 his older brother was already serving in the war there, he was
 assigned instead to a hardship tour, guarding the
 demilitarized zone at Camp Paine, Korea; he advanced to the
 rank of gunner and received his honorable discharge in 1974,
 after also completing reserve duty; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Jones worked as an electrician and he was
 employed with family members in a number of businesses, including
 a tire shop and a pipeline construction company; he was also a
 trucker for many years and contracted with a number of different
 companies before retiring in 2018; in his leisure time, he
 enjoyed hunting and fishing; and
 WHEREAS, On May 16, 1973, Mr. Jones married Margie Bryan in
 a ceremony held in Pineland; they raised two sons, Shane and
 Chad, and through the years, they were further blessed with four
 grandchildren, Matthew, Carson, Connor, and Ashlyn, who were his
 pride and joy; devoted to his family, Mr. Jones was especially
 close to his sister, Charlene, and her husband, Nat, whom he
 called his "second dad"; he was sustained by a strong faith from
 an early age; and
 WHEREAS, Although Corbet Jones will be deeply missed, he
 has left his family and friends with a wealth of memories that
 they will forever treasure; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life
 of Corbet Nicholos Jones and extend sincere condolences to the
 members of his family: to his wife, Margie Bryan Jones; to his
 sons, Shane Bryan and his wife, Kimberly, and Chad Jones and his
 wife, Wendy; to his grandsons, Matthew Bryan, Carson Jones, and
 Connor Jones; to his granddaughter, Ashlyn Bryan; to his
 brothers, Kenneth Jones and his wife, Emma, and Isaac Jones and
 his wife, Julie; to his sister, Charlene Willey, and her husband,
 Nathaniel; to his sisters-in-law, Jeannie Williams and her
 husband, Jimmy, and Gloria Purvis; and to his many other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Corbet Jones.
 Nichols, Flores
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on November 2, 2023, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate