E | 12/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
E | 12/01/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 113 | |
Senate | 12/01/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 67 | |
House | 11/30/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 110 | |
House | 11/30/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 113 | |
House | 11/30/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 111 | |
Senate | 11/30/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 63 | |
Senate | 11/21/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 56 | |
House | 11/17/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 82 | |
House | 11/17/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 82 | |
House | 11/13/2023 | Filed |