Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas House Bill HR56 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/05/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 56


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of William
 Henderson Bowlin, a proud veteran of the U.S. Army, who passed away
 on September 29, 2023, at the age of 93; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Hazel Mabel Pickering Bowlin and
 Henderson Wakefield Bowlin, William Bowlin was born in Worth
 County, Missouri, on July 30, 1930, and grew up on the family farm
 with a sister, Betty; he completed his bachelor's degree in civil
 engineering at Missouri University of Science and
 Technology-Rolla; on August 8, 1951, he married the former Cora Mae
 Stabe, and they eventually became the parents of five children,
 Stephanie, Stanley, Suzanne, Sandra, and Sonya; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Bowlin served in the army from 1952 to 1954; he
 trained at Fort Lewis in Washington and then helped France rebuild
 its infrastructure; while living in the country, he and his wife
 formed many lasting friendships; he held the rank of first
 lieutenant and earned the National Defense Service Medal; and
 WHEREAS, During the late 1950s, the Bowlins lived in Dallas;
 Mr. Bowlin worked as a civil engineer and then followed his dream of
 entrepreneurship, establishing a commercial insulation business;
 an early adopter of technology, he purchased one of the first
 personal computers, a Radio Shack TRS-80, and he learned to write
 code that he used in his business; he owned 22 personal computers
 over the years; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Bowlin was a humble, hardworking man; deeply
 devoted to his family, he loved reunions and other gatherings; in
 addition, he enjoyed genealogy research, and he was able to trace
 both his and his wife's roots back to the 1500s; Mrs. Bowlin passed
 away in 2019, and his daughter, Suzanne, became his primary
 caregiver; and
 WHEREAS, Although William Bowlin is sadly missed by his
 friends and loved ones, he leaves behind a legacy that will long be
 treasured by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 4th Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 William Henderson Bowlin and extend sincere sympathy to the members
 of his family: to his children, Stephanie Miller, Stanley Bowlin
 and his wife, Cheryl, Suzanne Bowlin, Sandra Luckcuck and her
 husband, Alan, and Sonya Downs and her husband, Bill; to his
 grandchildren and their spouses, David and Mary Miller, Max Miller,
 Kyle Downs, Matthew and Shelby Downs, Rachel Luckcuck, Lexie
 Luckcuck, and Skyler Bowlin; and to his other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family.
 Shaheen
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 56 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on December 5, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House