Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas House Bill HR58 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/05/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 58


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Residents of Lubbock lost an esteemed community
 leader with the passing of Delbert McDougal on November 10, 2023, at
 the age of 86; and
 WHEREAS, Delbert McDougal was born on January 29, 1937, in
 Smyer to Chester and Alda McDougal; he learned the importance of
 hard work at an early age, spending his youth chopping weeds in a
 cotton patch for 45 cents an hour, and in 1955, he graduated from
 Smyer High School; on April 2, 1961, he wed the love of his life,
 Carolyn Ratliff, and the couple shared a rewarding marriage that
 spanned more than six decades; and
 WHEREAS, After taking college business courses and working
 for General Electric, this esteemed Texan enjoyed a successful
 career in home building, property development, construction, and
 real estate; active in his community, he was a member of dozens of
 boards, including the Electric Utility Board of Lubbock Power &
 Light, Market Lubbock, University Medical Center, Lubbock Reese
 Redevelopment Authority, West Texas Home Builders Association,
 Wayland Baptist University, and the Lubbock Apartment Association,
 among others; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to his family, Mr. McDougal took
 great pride in his sons, Marc and Mike, and with the passing years,
 his treasured family grew to include his four grandchildren, Tara,
 Tyler, Hudson, and Harrison, and four great-grandchildren, Tye,
 Miles, Clara Kate, and Lottie; in his leisure time, he took pleasure
 in spending time at the lake with family, and he traveled to each of
 the seven continents during his lifetime; he was also an avid fan of
 the New York Yankees and attended nine World Series games, which
 included taking four generations of McDougals to the Fall Classic;
 a man of deep faith, he was a member of First Baptist Church; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Delbert McDougal brings great
 sadness to his loved ones, he leaves behind a legacy that will long
 be treasured by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature, 4th Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Delbert McDougal and extend sincere condolences to the members of
 his family: to his wife, Carolyn McDougal; to his sons, Marc
 McDougal and his wife, Pam, and Mike McDougal and his wife, Melissa;
 to his grandchildren, Tara Lashford and her husband, Patrick, Tyler
 McDougal and his wife, Audra, Hudson McDougal, and Harrison
 McDougal; to his great-grandchildren, Tye, Miles, Clara Kate, and
 Lottie; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Delbert
 McDougal.
 Burrows
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 58 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on December 5, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House