E
|
12/18/2023
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
March 5, 2024
|
|
E
|
12/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 79
|
E
|
11/27/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 60
|
House
|
11/27/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 110
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 57
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 54
|
Senate
|
11/16/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 41
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 76
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 76
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#48
|
Journal Page: 75
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 75
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
10-Walle
|
Journal Page: 66
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#47
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Walle
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#46
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Bryant
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#45
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-J. Jones
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#44
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Turner
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#43
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#42
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Bhojani
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#41
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-T. King, Raymond, E. Morales, Romero, Ordaz, Guillen, and J. Lopez
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#40
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Ordaz
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#39
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Walle
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#38
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 48
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 43
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 42
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Motion for the previous question
|
|
Journal Page: 42
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#33
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 14-Howard and M. González
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#32
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 13-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#31
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 12-Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#30
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 11-Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#29
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Perez
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#28
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#27
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#26
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#25
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Morales Shaw
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#23
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#19
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Garcia
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#16
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#13
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 24
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
11/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 11
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 7
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 7
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#10
|
Journal Page: 24
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Neave Criado
|
Journal Page: 24
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 37
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 31
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA13 Eckhardt
|
Journal Page: 31
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA13 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Blanco
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 24
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 24
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 23
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 8
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 7
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 38
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 7
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 7
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/07/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|