Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis November 9, 2023
Bill November 7, 2023
Bill November 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill November 11, 2023
Analysis November 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 10, 2023
Bill November 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis February 9, 2024
Bill November 21, 2023
Bill November 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill November 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note November 10, 2023
Fiscal Note November 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis November 10, 2023
Analysis November 9, 2023