E | 12/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 79 | |
E | 12/05/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 79 | |
House | 12/05/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 110 | |
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 78 | |
Senate | 12/05/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 79 | |
Senate | 12/05/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 77 | |
House | 12/05/2023 | Adopted | Journal Page: 109 | |
House | 12/05/2023 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 109 | |
House | 11/17/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 100 | |
Senate | 11/16/2023 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 53 | |
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/15/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |