Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SCR7 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/05/2023

                            S.C.R. No. 7


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The life of an admired rancher, businessman, and
 civic leader drew to a close with the passing of James Ratliff Hurt
 Sr. of Ector County on November 2, 2023, at the age of 93; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Mary Ratliff Hurt and Sam Fuqua Hurt Sr.,
 "Buzz" Hurt was born on April 29, 1930, in Austin; he and his
 brother, Sam, grew up on the ranch founded by their grandparents in
 northeastern Ector County, and it remained his home for most of his
 life; after graduating from Odessa High School, he attended The
 University of Texas at Austin until his father's death in 1950, when
 he returned home to manage Ratliff Ranch; he played an active role
 in developing the petroleum reserves under his land and ran
 numerous companies, among them Z-Bar Ranch and Cattle Company,
 Ratliff Ranch Development Company, PBP Fabrication, Incorporated,
 and Eureka Prospecting Company; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hurt wed Freddie Jean Wheeler in 1950, and they
 were blessed with four children, Mary Helen, Jay, Joe, and Sally; in
 1983, he married the former Betsy Triplett, and during their
 39-year marriage, they enjoyed their common interests of travel,
 serving their community, and caring for their many dogs and cats; a
 skilled baker of artisanal bread, Mr. Hurt delighted in giving away
 loaves and teaching others the craft; he was also a talented
 aviator, competing in aerobatics and earning recognition as a
 Master Pilot from the Federal Aviation Administration; and
 WHEREAS, Furthering his family's tradition of civic
 engagement, Mr. Hurt served as a charter member of the Ector County
 Airport board and a trustee of the Ector County Independent School
 District; he volunteered with such organizations as the Sandhills
 Hereford and Quarter Horse Show and Championship Rodeo, the Ector
 County Livestock Show, and Globe of the Great Southwest; in
 addition, he and his family donated land for Ratliff Stadium,
 Ratliff Ranch Golf Links, the Bridge United Methodist Church, City
 of Odessa Fire Station No. 9, and three roadway rights-of-way; he
 was named the 1985 Heritage of Odessa Community Statesman for
 Ranching, and he and Betsy Hurt were named the 1996 Citizens of the
 Year by the Odessa Chamber of Commerce and 2020 Friend of the Arts
 honorees by Odessa Arts; Mr. Hurt was a member of Wesley United
 Methodist Community Group and brought communion bread to the group
 the day before he died; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply dedicated to his family and his community,
 Buzz Hurt earned the lasting respect and admiration of all who were
 privileged to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas,
 4th Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of James Ratliff
 Hurt Sr. and extend sincere sympathy to the members of his family:
 to his wife of 39 years, Betsy Hurt; to his children, Mary Helen
 Johnson, Joseph Stewart Hurt and his wife, Sherry, and Sally Beth
 Bolton and her husband, Toya; to Vickie Hurt, the widow of his son,
 Jay; to his 13 grandchildren and 18 great-grandchildren; and to his
 other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Buzz Hurt Sr.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 7 was adopted by the Senate
 on November 16, 2023, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 7 was adopted by the House
 on December 5, 2023, by a rising vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor