Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR40 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 11/30/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 40
 In Memory
 of
 Suzanne Linbeck Reynolds
 WHEREAS, All who shared in the life of Suzanne Linbeck
 Reynolds of Houston were deeply saddened by her passing on
 January 18, 2023, at the age of 85; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Leo Edward Linbeck and Patti Ruth
 Maloney Linbeck, the former Suzanne Linbeck was born in Houston on
 July 29, 1937; she grew up with a brother, Leo, and a sister,
 Patricia "Poppy," and attended St. Anne Catholic School, St. Agnes
 Academy, St. Mary's College, Barat College, and the University of
 St. Thomas; and
 WHEREAS, She married the love of her life, Frank Fisher
 Reynolds Jr., on September 7, 1959; they became the proud parents
 of five children, Frank, Stephen, Kent, Suzanne, and Andrea, and
 provided them with a foundation of strong faith; eventually,
 Mrs. Reynolds was blessed with 12 grandchildren, and she instilled
 in them the same enduring values; her greatest delight was spending
 time with her loved ones, and she especially enjoyed shopping with
 her grandchildren for their birthdays and attending their school
 events; she shared a fulfilling marriage of 54 years with her
 husband until his passing; and
 WHEREAS, A devout, longtime member of St. Anne and Holy
 Rosary Parishes, Mrs. Reynolds belonged to the Knights of the
 Holy Sepulchre, the Knights of Malta, St. Anne's Guild, and the
 Charity Guild of Catholic Women; moreover, she was a founder and
 leader in both Houston Right to Life and Texas Right to Life; she
 also served on the board of the University of St. Thomas; and
 WHEREAS, Although Suzanne Reynolds is sadly missed, her
 steadfast commitment to her family and her faith will forever
 remain a source of inspiration to all who were fortunate enough to
 know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, 4th Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Suzanne Linbeck Reynolds and extend sincere sympathy to the members
 of her family:  to her children, Frank Fisher Reynolds III and his
 wife, Maria, the Reverend Stephen Bartlett Reynolds, Kent Linbeck
 Reynolds and his wife, Alissa, Suzanne "Muffet" Reynolds Laine and
 her husband, Matthew, and Andrea Leigh Reynolds; to her
 grandchildren, Fisher Reynolds IV and his wife, Brooke, Kayla
 Tompkins, Stephen, Carmen, Rebecca, Virginia, Thomas, and John
 Reynolds, Reid, Caroline, and Charles Laine, and Matthew Laine Jr.;
 to her great-grandchild, Jacqueline Reynolds; to her
 brothers-in-law, Peter Doyle, Norman Reynolds and his wife, Sally,
 and Richard Reynolds and his wife, Susie; to her sisters-in-law,
 Bette Linbeck and Judy Brand; and to her many other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Suzanne Reynolds.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on November 30, 2023,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate