Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR80 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 12/05/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 80
 In Memory
 of
 Billy Hughes
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of Billy Lee Hughes of Golden, who passed away on
 April 30, 2023, at the age of 79; and
 WHEREAS, A lifelong resident of Golden, Billy Hughes was
 born to Ernest and Frances Hughes on July 16, 1943, and grew up
 with three brothers, Mike, Sam, and Bob, and two sisters,
 Francine and Anna; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hughes enjoyed a successful career as a
 brakeman and conductor and retired after 43 years of service to
 the Union Pacific Railroad; in his leisure hours, one of his
 favorite pastimes was growing watermelons; and
 WHEREAS, On August 19, 1981, Mr. Hughes married Jo Ann
 Nahrstedt, and the couple shared a rewarding union that spanned
 37 years until her passing; Mr. Hughes was the proud father of
 two children, Ernest and Jennifer, and he was further blessed
 with three grandchildren, Morgan, Reagan, and Jackson, and a
 great-grandson, Tate; and
 WHEREAS, While his loss is difficult to bear, Billy Hughes
 leaves behind numerous loved ones whose lives are far richer for
 having known him, and he will always hold a treasured place in
 their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 88th
 Legislature, 4th Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Billy Lee Hughes and extend sincere condolences to all who
 mourn his passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Billy Hughes.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on December 5, 2023, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate