Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House Elections Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
05/08/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
04/30/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/30/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/24/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 7:41PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/24/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 7:41PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/17/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/17/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:45PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
04/09/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/03/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/27/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 H Left pending in committee
03/20/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/20/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Considered in Calendars
03/13/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Corrected committee report sent to Calendars