Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Left pending in committee