Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 8:11PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .