Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1602 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1533 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#589 | Journal Page: 1909 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1903 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1903 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Postponed | 4/25/25 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1819 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1831 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1433 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to s/c on Dis Prev & Women's & Children's Health by Speaker | Journal Page: 604 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 604 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Filed |