Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1094 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/14/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Posting rule suspended
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 8:56PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 7 2025 5:42PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Sent to the Governor
04/14/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 8:56PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 7 2025 5:42PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Sent to the Governor
04/10/2025
SB1
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Finance
04/09/2025
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Sent to the Governor
04/09/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/23/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 E Sent to the Governor
03/17/2025 10:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/14/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar