Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1421 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#389 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1667 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#389 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1667 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#337 | Journal Page: 1608 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#337 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1620 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1619 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1381 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred to s/c on Workforce by Speaker | Journal Page: 461 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 461 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |