Senate | 05/07/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2890 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Record vote | RV#1436 | Journal Page: 2889 |
House | 05/06/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2889 | |
House | 05/06/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2889 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2812 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2812 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 463 | |
House | 03/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 463 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |