Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1175 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/25/2025 8:00 am
HB7
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House