LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1199
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1199
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1199
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/01/2025
8:00 am
Human Services Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.030
HB741
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB1199
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2070
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2402
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
HB2542
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
HB2665
Introduced
Last Action: 04/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB2789
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB3096
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
HB3396
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3595
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
HB3747
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB4116
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4127
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call