Senate
|
05/08/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1603
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1509
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2074
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#570
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1884
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#522
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote RV#522
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Zwiener
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote RV#521
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1790
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Amended 1-Zwiener
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 471
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 471
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|