Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1238 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/08/2025

                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Parker) H.B. No. 1238
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2025;
 April 29, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 8, 2025, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of the location of a proposed Class I
 injection well.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 27.016, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 27.016.  INSPECTION OF WELL LOCATION.  (a)  On receiving
 an application for a permit, the executive director shall:
 (1)  have an inspection made of the location of the
 proposed disposal well to determine the local conditions and the
 probable effect of the well; and
 (2)  [shall] determine the requirements for the setting
 of casing, as provided in Sections 27.051, 27.055, and 27.056 [of
 this code].
 (b)  For a proposed Class I injection well, the executive
 director may satisfy the requirements of Subsection (a) by
 accepting an inspection report prepared by an engineer or
 geoscientist licensed in this state.  The report must:
 (1)  confirm that the engineer or geoscientist
 inspected the location of the proposed injection well to determine
 the local conditions and the probable effect of the well; and
 (2)  state the engineer's or geoscientist's
 determination regarding the requirements for the setting of casing
 as required by Subsection (a)(2).
 (c)  An engineer or geoscientist may conduct an inspection
 under Subsection (b)(1):
 (1)  in person at the location of the proposed
 injection well; or
 (2)  virtually through:
 (A)  satellite or other aerial imagery;
 (B)  mapping software; or
 (C)  other appropriate information sources.
 (d)  The executive director may require an engineer or
 geoscientist that submits a virtual inspection described by
 Subsection (c)(2) to conduct an additional in-person inspection if
 the initial visual inspection reveals an issue the executive
 director determines merits an in-person inspection.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a permit application filed with the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 permit application filed before the effective date of this Act is
 subject to the law in effect on the date the application is filed,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *