Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1245 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/12/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R2988 JAM-F
 By: Goodwin H.B. No. 1245




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition on the use of water on nonresidential
 property to irrigate nonfunctional turf during a drought.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.1272(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  A [By May 1, 2005, a] drought contingency plan required
 by commission rule adopted under this section must:
 (1)  include specific, quantified targets for water use
 reductions that are:
 (A)  to be achieved during periods of water
 shortages and drought; and
 (B)  established by the [.  The] entity preparing
 the plan;
 (2)  prohibit the use of water on nonresidential
 property to irrigate nonfunctional turf, as defined by commission
 rule, during periods of water shortages and drought; and
 (3)  include methods for enforcing compliance with the
 prohibition described by Subdivision (2) [shall establish the
 targets].
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2026, the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement Section 11.1272(c), Water Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than May 1, 2026, a wholesale or retail public
 water supplier or an irrigation district required to develop a
 drought contingency plan under Section 11.1272, Water Code, shall
 update that plan to implement Section 11.1272(c), Water Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.