Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1310 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/14/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hickland H.B. No. 1310




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an annual report on the costs to this state and
 political subdivisions of providing health care services to foreign
 patients.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 525, Government Code, as
 effective April 1, 2025, is amended by adding Section 525.0304 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 525.0304.  ANNUAL REPORT ON COSTS OF PROVIDING HEALTH
 CARE SERVICES TO FOREIGN PATIENTS. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Emergency care" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 1301.155, Insurance Code.
 (2)  "Political subdivision" includes a municipality,
 county, and hospital district in this state.
 (b)  The commission shall quarterly collect information on
 the costs incurred by this state and political subdivisions for
 providing at public hospitals inpatient health care services and
 emergency care to uninsured patients who are not citizens or lawful
 permanent residents of the United States.
 (c)  A public hospital providing inpatient health care
 services or emergency care to a patient described by Subsection (b)
 shall inform the patient that:
 (1)  the hospital must provide to the commission the
 information described by Subsection (b); and
 (2)  the provision of the information does not affect
 or limit the hospital's duty to provide the patient care under
 federal law.
 (d)  Not later than January 1 of each year, the commission
 shall submit to the governor and the legislature a written report
 outlining the costs incurred by this state and political
 subdivisions for providing inpatient health care services and
 emergency care to patients described by Subsection (b), including
 any recommendations regarding options available for this state to
 seek reimbursement for those costs from the federal government.
 (e)  The executive commissioner shall adopt any rules
 necessary to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than October 1, 2025, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt any necessary rules as required by Section 525.0304,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall:
 (1)  begin collecting the information required by
 Section 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than November 1, 2025; and
 (2)  submit the first report required by Section
 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.