By: Hickland H.B. No. 1310 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to an annual report on the costs to this state and political subdivisions of providing health care services to foreign patients. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 525, Government Code, as effective April 1, 2025, is amended by adding Section 525.0304 to read as follows: Sec. 525.0304. ANNUAL REPORT ON COSTS OF PROVIDING HEALTH CARE SERVICES TO FOREIGN PATIENTS. (a) In this section: (1) "Emergency care" has the meaning assigned by Section 1301.155, Insurance Code. (2) "Political subdivision" includes a municipality, county, and hospital district in this state. (b) The commission shall quarterly collect information on the costs incurred by this state and political subdivisions for providing at public hospitals inpatient health care services and emergency care to uninsured patients who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents of the United States. (c) A public hospital providing inpatient health care services or emergency care to a patient described by Subsection (b) shall inform the patient that: (1) the hospital must provide to the commission the information described by Subsection (b); and (2) the provision of the information does not affect or limit the hospital's duty to provide the patient care under federal law. (d) Not later than January 1 of each year, the commission shall submit to the governor and the legislature a written report outlining the costs incurred by this state and political subdivisions for providing inpatient health care services and emergency care to patients described by Subsection (b), including any recommendations regarding options available for this state to seek reimbursement for those costs from the federal government. (e) The executive commissioner shall adopt any rules necessary to implement this section. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than October 1, 2025, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt any necessary rules as required by Section 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act. (b) The Health and Human Services Commission shall: (1) begin collecting the information required by Section 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than November 1, 2025; and (2) submit the first report required by Section 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than January 1, 2027. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.