1 | 1 | | By: Hickland H.B. No. 1310 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 7 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 8 | | relating to an annual report on the costs to this state and |
---|
9 | 9 | | political subdivisions of providing health care services to foreign |
---|
10 | 10 | | patients. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 525, Government Code, as |
---|
13 | 13 | | effective April 1, 2025, is amended by adding Section 525.0304 to |
---|
14 | 14 | | read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 525.0304. ANNUAL REPORT ON COSTS OF PROVIDING HEALTH |
---|
16 | 16 | | CARE SERVICES TO FOREIGN PATIENTS. (a) In this section: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) "Emergency care" has the meaning assigned by |
---|
18 | 18 | | Section 1301.155, Insurance Code. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Political subdivision" includes a municipality, |
---|
20 | 20 | | county, and hospital district in this state. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) The commission shall quarterly collect information on |
---|
22 | 22 | | the costs incurred by this state and political subdivisions for |
---|
23 | 23 | | providing at public hospitals inpatient health care services and |
---|
24 | 24 | | emergency care to uninsured patients who are not citizens or lawful |
---|
25 | 25 | | permanent residents of the United States. |
---|
26 | 26 | | (c) A public hospital providing inpatient health care |
---|
27 | 27 | | services or emergency care to a patient described by Subsection (b) |
---|
28 | 28 | | shall inform the patient that: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) the hospital must provide to the commission the |
---|
30 | 30 | | information described by Subsection (b); and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (2) the provision of the information does not affect |
---|
32 | 32 | | or limit the hospital's duty to provide the patient care under |
---|
33 | 33 | | federal law. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (d) Not later than January 1 of each year, the commission |
---|
35 | 35 | | shall submit to the governor and the legislature a written report |
---|
36 | 36 | | outlining the costs incurred by this state and political |
---|
37 | 37 | | subdivisions for providing inpatient health care services and |
---|
38 | 38 | | emergency care to patients described by Subsection (b), including |
---|
39 | 39 | | any recommendations regarding options available for this state to |
---|
40 | 40 | | seek reimbursement for those costs from the federal government. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (e) The executive commissioner shall adopt any rules |
---|
42 | 42 | | necessary to implement this section. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than October 1, 2025, the |
---|
44 | 44 | | executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission |
---|
45 | 45 | | shall adopt any necessary rules as required by Section 525.0304, |
---|
46 | 46 | | Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (b) The Health and Human Services Commission shall: |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) begin collecting the information required by |
---|
49 | 49 | | Section 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later |
---|
50 | 50 | | than November 1, 2025; and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) submit the first report required by Section |
---|
52 | 52 | | 525.0304, Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than |
---|
53 | 53 | | January 1, 2027. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|