Senate | 05/05/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1308 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2690 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1203 | Journal Page: 2564 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1203 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2563 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Referred to s/c on International Relations by Speaker | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 488 | |
House | 11/15/2024 | Filed |