Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1838 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#380 | Journal Page: 1670 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1670 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1670 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1598 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | RV#325 | Journal Page: 1602 |
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Record vote RV#325 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1610 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 510 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 510 | |
House | 03/11/2025 | Filed |