Senate | 05/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | RV#224 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1450 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | RV#208 | Journal Page: 1430 |
House | 04/15/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Record vote RV#208 | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 880 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 436 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Filed |