Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2025
Fiscal Note March 5, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List March 31, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note March 25, 2025
Fiscal Note March 9, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2025