Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1470 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/25/2024

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R5899 LRM-D
 By: Reynolds H.B. No. 1470




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a task force to study the legal and societal barriers to
 equality for transgender persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "task force" means the
 transgender equality task force established by this Act.
 (b)  The task force is established to study the legal and
 societal barriers to equality for transgender persons in this
 state.
 (c)  The task force is composed of:
 (1)  11 members appointed by the governor as follows:
 (A)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Banking;
 (B)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice;
 (C)  one representative of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services;
 (D)  one representative of the Texas Department of
 Insurance;
 (E)  one representative of the Department of State
 Health Services;
 (F)  one representative of the Texas Education
 Agency;
 (G)  one representative of the Health and Human
 Services Commission;
 (H)  one representative of an institution of
 higher education;
 (I)  one representative of the Texas Workforce
 Commission civil rights division;
 (J)  one representative of the Texas Workforce
 Commission division of workforce development; and
 (K)  one representative of a nonprofit
 organization dedicated to civil rights;
 (2)  two members appointed by the lieutenant governor
 as follows:
 (A)  a parent or guardian of a transgender person;
 and
 (B)  an attorney who specializes in transgender
 rights; and
 (3)  two members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives as follows:
 (A)  a physician who specializes in transgender
 health issues; and
 (B)  one transgender person.
 (d)  The task force shall hold its first meeting not later
 than October 1, 2025, and shall elect a presiding officer from among
 its membership.  The task force shall hold subsequent meetings at
 least quarterly at the call of the presiding officer.
 (e)  A task force member is not entitled to compensation for
 service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement, as
 provided by the General Appropriations Act, for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in performing task force duties. The
 task force may accept gifts, grants, and donations to pay for those
 expenses.
 (f)  The Texas Workforce Commission civil rights division
 shall provide administrative support services at the request of the
 task force.
 (g)  The task force shall study the state actions necessary
 to ensure equality and improve the lives of transgender persons,
 with particular attention to the following areas:
 (1)  health care, including access to health care
 providers who are trained in transgender medical issues;
 (2)  long-term care for transgender persons who are
 chronically ill or of advanced age;
 (3)  education;
 (4)  higher education;
 (5)  housing, including homelessness prevention and
 reduction;
 (6)  employment; and
 (7)  criminal justice, including the following:
 (A)  raising transgender awareness among law
 enforcement through training; and
 (B)  facilitating the appropriate placement of
 transgender persons in correctional facilities based on a person's
 gender identity.
 (h)  A state agency shall cooperate with and assist the task
 force in carrying out the duties of the task force.
 (i)  Not later than December 1, 2026, the task force shall
 prepare and submit to the governor and the legislature a written
 report that summarizes the task force's findings under this section
 and recommends solutions for advancing transgender equality and
 improving the lives of transgender persons in this state.
 (j)  The task force is abolished and this Act expires
 September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.