Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 8 2025 3:14PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar