Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1527 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/15/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 3:14PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 4:21PM
04/15/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 3:14PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 12:45PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 4:21PM