LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB1534
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1534
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1534
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/07/2025
2:00 pm
S/C on Family & Fiduciary Relationships Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB168
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB1044
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB1534
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:16PM
HB1914
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:16PM
HB2240
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2530
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3284
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3395
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3515
Introduced
Last Action: 04/07/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
HB3783
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4034
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4213
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars