Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#992 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2318 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2318 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote RV#992 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2178 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#845 | Journal Page: 2179 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2178 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#845 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2173 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1653 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 514 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 514 | |
House | 12/09/2024 | Filed |