Senate | 04/24/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1486 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1906 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1769 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#484 | Journal Page: 1769 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1769 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#484 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1769 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1721 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | RV#442 | Journal Page: 1720 |
House | 04/23/2025 | Record vote RV#442 | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 517 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 517 | |
House | 12/12/2024 | Filed |