Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1633 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2024
Fiscal Note December 16, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List April 8, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025
Bill April 8, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Bill April 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2025