House | 05/07/2025 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/21/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 12/16/2024 | Filed |