House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed | 5/10/25 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2561 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2561 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Postponed 5/10/25 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to s/c on County & Regional Government by Speaker | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 520 | |
House | 12/17/2024 | Filed |