Senate | 05/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1631 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2648 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#970 | Journal Page: 2301 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2301 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2299 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2159 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#822 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#822 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2156 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1062 | |
House | 04/01/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 02/27/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 329 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |