Senate | 04/23/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1370 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Record vote | RV#313 | Journal Page: 1570 |
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1529 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably with amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 525 | |
House | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 525 | |
House | 12/20/2024 | Filed |