Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1710 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/22/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
04/22/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
03/19/2025 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:57PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Considered in Calendars